Appointment
: The chief Justice of India is appointed by the President. Other
Judges of the Supreme Court are appointed by the president in
consultation with the chief justice. He may also consult other judges
of the Supreme Court and high Courts while appointing a judge to the
Supreme Court.
Tenure : Judges of the Supreme Court can hold office up to the age of 65 years.
Qualification : Any citizen of India who has been a judge of a High Court for 5 years, or in the opinion of the President, is an eminent jurist or who has been a practicing advocate in a High Court for a period of 10 years can be nominated as a judge of the Supreme Court [Article 124(3)].
Here is a full list of Chief Justices of Supreme Court in India–
Tenure : Judges of the Supreme Court can hold office up to the age of 65 years.
Qualification : Any citizen of India who has been a judge of a High Court for 5 years, or in the opinion of the President, is an eminent jurist or who has been a practicing advocate in a High Court for a period of 10 years can be nominated as a judge of the Supreme Court [Article 124(3)].
Here is a full list of Chief Justices of Supreme Court in India–
No. |
Chief Justices
|
Period of office
|
1. |
H. J. Kania
|
August, 1947 – November, 1951 |
2. |
M. Patanjali Sastri
|
November, 1951 – January, 1954 |
3. |
Mehar Chand Mahajan
|
January, 1954 – December, 1954 |
4. |
B.K. Mukherjea
|
December, 1954 – January, 1956 |
5. |
S.R. Das
|
February, 1956 – September, 1959 |
6. |
B. P. Sinha
|
October, 1959 – January, 1964 |
7. |
P.B. Gajendragadkar
|
February, 1964 – March, 1966 |
8. |
A.K. Sarkar
|
March, 1966 – June, 1966 |
9. |
K. Subba Rao
|
June, 1966 – April, 1967 |
10. |
K.N. Wanchoo
|
April, 1967 – February, 1968 |
11. |
M. Hidayatullah
|
February, 1968 – December, 1970 |
12. |
J.C. Shah
|
December, 1970 – January, 1971 |
13. |
S.M. Sikri
|
January, 1971 – April, 1973 |
14. |
A.N. Ray
|
April, 1973 – January, 1977 |
15. |
M.H. Beg
|
January, 1977 – February, 1978 |
16. |
Y.V. Chandrachud
|
February, 1978 – July, 1985 |
17. |
P. N. Bhagwati
|
July, 1985 – December, 1986 |
18. |
R.S. Pathak
|
December, 1986 – June, 1989 |
19. |
E.S. Venkataramiah
|
June, 1989 – December, 1989 |
20. |
Sabyasachi Mukharjee
|
December, 1989 – September, 1990 |
21. |
Ranganath Mishra |
September, 1990 – November, 1991 |
22. |
K.N. Singh
|
November, 1991 – December, 1991 |
23. |
M.H. Kania
|
December, 1991 – November, 1992 |
24. |
L.M. Sharma
|
November, 1992 – February, 1993 |
25. |
M.N. Venkatachaliah
|
February, 1993 – October, 1994 |
26. |
Aziz Mushabbar Ahmadi
|
October, 1994 – March, 1997 |
27. |
J.S. Verma
|
March, 1997 – January, 1998 |
28. |
M.M. Punchhi
|
January, 1998 – October, 1998 |
29. |
A.S. Anand
|
October, 1998 – November, 2001 |
30. |
S. P. Bharucha
|
November, 2001 – May, 2002 |
31. |
Bhupinder Nath Kripal
|
May, 2002 – November, 2002 |
32. |
Mr. G.B Pattanaik
|
November, 2002 – December, 2002 |
33. |
Mr. V.N. Khare
|
December, 2002 – May, 2004 |
34. |
Mr. S. Rajendra Babu
|
May, 2004 – June, 2004
|
35. |
R. C. Lahoti
|
June, 2004 – 31 October, 2005
|
36. |
Y. K. Sabharwal
|
2 November, 2005 – 14 January, 2007
|
37. |
K.G. Balakrishnan
|
15 January, 2007 – 11 May, 2010
|
38. |
S. H. Kapadia
|
12 May, 2010 – 28 September, 2012
|
39. |
Altamas Kabir
|
29 September, 2012 – 18 July, 2013
|
40. |
P. Sathasivam
|
19 July, 2013 – 26 April, 2014 |
41.
|
Rajendra Mal Lodha |
27 April, 2014 – 27 September, 2014 |
42.
|
H. L. Dattu |
28 September, 2014 – 2 December, 2015 |
43.
|
T. S. Thakur |
3 December, 2015 – 3 January, 2017 |
44.
|
Jagdish Singh Khehar |
4 January, 2017 – Till Date |